HI HB389 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB389
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriates funds to the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation and the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands for improving and increasing the existing public and affordable housing stock in the State. Requires both agencies to each submit reports to the Legislature prior to the 2018 and 2019 Regular Sessions on the set-aside plan for upkeep and maintenance of the housing facilities to be constructed. (HB389 HD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 478) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decison-making on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB389 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).