HI HB385 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB385
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the R.E.A.C.H (Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health) Program to provide a standardized framework and funding for after-school programs in public middle and intermediate schools. Establishes a special fund to receive fees and other moneys to supplement the costs of administering and operating the R.E.A.C.H. Program. (HB385 HD1)
Title
Relating To After-school Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Souki excused (2). |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 36) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2017-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 02-01-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB500 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB385 (Carry Over) 2017-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Souki excused (2).
HB385 (Carry Over) 2017-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Souki excused (2).
Subjects
After-school Programs
Office of Youth Services
Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health Program
Special Fund ($)
Office of Youth Services
Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health Program
Special Fund ($)