HI HB378 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the usage of native Hawaiian land plants for the landscaping of public buildings. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB378 HD2)
Title
Public Property; Landscaping; Preference for Native Hawaiian Land Plants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 508) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 02-16-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HAW with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from ERB/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 168) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HAW. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Marumoto, Pine. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB/AGR on Wednesday, 02-02-11 9:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB/AGR, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |