HI HB376 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the Chief Election Officer is an at-will employee. Requires Elections Commission to provide notice and reason for removal of a Chief Election Officer. Requires a performance evaluation of the Chief Election Officer after a general election. Requires a public hearing on the Chief Election Officer's performance for purposes of considering reappointment. (HB376 HD2)
Title
Chief Election Officer; Elections Commission; Evaluation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 178). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 816) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-05 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Kawakami, Nakashima. |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 01-30-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |