HI HB370 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the permit requirement that an ambulance with paramedics be present at a mixed martial arts event.
Title
Mixed Martial Arts; Permit Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 206). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-25-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-13. |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 51), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 01-30-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1276 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=370&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB370_.HTM |