HI HB369 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the legislature shall have standing to intervene in any court proceeding involving a claim based upon a constitutional or statutory provision.
Title
Relating To Court Proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB369 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB860 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
SB860 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=369&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB369_.HTM |