HI HB359 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes administrative inspections within the West Hawaii regional fishery management area. (HD1)
Title
Aquatic Life; West Hawaii; Inspection; DLNR
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |