HI HB356 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires meetings of the judicial council to be open to the public, except for deliberations for the selection of nominees for the campaign spending commission and state ethics commission. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Judicial Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 6). |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Onishi, Tokioka voting no (6) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-02-11 | House | Deferred one day 02-12-21. |
2021-02-10 | House | Deferred one day 02-11-21. |
2021-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-02 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB356 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - Referred to JDC.