HI HB351 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the purpose of expenditures by the Hawaii public housing authority to make required repairs and renovations at public housing facilities to ensure compliance with state and federal law.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 513), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Chang, Coffman, Har, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Morita, Ching. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-13-09 1:00 PM in conference room 329. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-13-09 1:00 PM in conference room 325. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-13-09. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-11-09 10:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1294 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.