HI HB35 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB35

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the shipping container inspection program and shipping container inspection program special fund. Increases the maximum fine for each violation of the fireworks law. Requires PSD to submit reports to the legislature on implementation of the shipping container inspection program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Fireworks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-10HouseThe committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB35 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback