HI HB35 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB35
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that when a unit owner and association reach a payment plan to cure a nonjudicial foreclosure, completion of the payment plan is required to cure the default. Specifies that if a unit owner and an association have agreed on a payment plan to prevent a nonjudicial foreclosure from proceeding, any association fines imposed while the payment plan is in effect shall not be deemed a default under the payment plan. Clarifies the obligations of a unit owner and an association while a unit owner is not otherwise in default under a payment plan. Clarifies that the pay first, dispute later provisions in Hawaii's condominium law apply only to common expense assessments claimed by an association of apartment owners. Specifies that a unit or apartment owner who disputes the amount of an assessment may request a written statement about the assessment from the association, including that a unit or apartment owner may demand mediation prior to paying contested charges, other than common expense assessments. Specifies requirements for mediation on contested charges, except for common expense assessments. Repeals provisions addressing the application of common expense payments and delinquent fees. (HB35 HD1)
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 195) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-06-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-17, 2:00PM room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 01-31-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB35 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
Subjects
Association of Apartment Owners
Common Expense Assessments ($)
Condominium Owners
Condominium Property Regimes
Condominiums
Cure of Default
Disputed Charges
Mediation
Common Expense Assessments ($)
Condominium Owners
Condominium Property Regimes
Condominiums
Cure of Default
Disputed Charges
Mediation