HI HB342 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals deadline for counties electing to establish a county surcharge on state tax to pass an ordinance to enact the surcharge. Allows counties under 500,000 population to use proceeds without restriction. Ceases state deduction of 10% for costs if counties of Kauai, Maui, and Hawaii all adopt ordinances.
Title
County Surcharge on State Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 16 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=342&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB342_.HTM |