HI HB34 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB34
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the renewal period for driver licenses from every two years to every four years for persons 72 years of age or older.
Title
Relating To Driver Licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB34 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=34&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB34_.HTM |