HI HB336 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB336

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits courts of appeal from affirming, modifying, reversing, or vacating a matter on grounds other than those raised by the parties to the proceeding, unless the parties are provided the opportunity to brief the court and present oral argument on the matter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Courts Of Appeal.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-04HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB639 (Same As)
HB336 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback