HI HB333 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB333
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 2:30PM in Conference Room CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 2:30PM in Conference Room CR 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes peer-to-peer car-sharing and establishes regulations thereof. Establishes the peertopeer car-sharing surcharge tax on the operator of the peer-to-peer program. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Peer-to-peer Car-sharing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 2:30PM in Conference Room CR 329. |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 10:00AM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 10:00AM; CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:15AM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads, Baker, Inouye Co-Chairs. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 670) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1653) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:55AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1168) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 03-18-21 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 211). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 854) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 505) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 201) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | House | Re-referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB333 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 2:30PM in Conference Room CR 329.