HI HB321 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB321
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 11:30AM in conference room CR 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 11:30AM in conference room CR 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the distribution of transit accommodations tax revenues to the counties. Authorizes each county to impose a surcharge on transient accommodations tax. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 11:30AM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 11:15AM in conference room CR 309. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Luke Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Kidani, Wakai, Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 667) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-29-21 3:00PM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-21 9:40AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-25-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-25-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 208). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, LoPresti, McKelvey, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso, Tam, Wildberger; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Perruso, Tokioka, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:05AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB321 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 11:30AM in conference room CR 325.
SB926 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.
SB926 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.