HI HB316 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB316
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the safe routes to school advisory committee within the Planning Branch of the Highways Division of the Department of Transportation. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Safe Routes To School.
Sponsors
Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Elle Cochran [D] | Rep. Natalia Hussey-Burdick [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1081 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB316 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to TRN, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB316 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to TRN, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=316&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB316_.HTM |