HI HB316 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB316
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to ECD, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to ECD, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that up to $50,000 per year in income earned and proceeds derived from stock options or stock by an employee from a qualified high technology business, as defined therein, or an investor who qualifies for a high technology business investment tax credit, shall be excluded from taxation, provided the employee or investor is a resident of the State, and provided further that amounts in excess of $50,000 in the taxable year shall be taxed at the applicable income tax rate.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to ECD, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB316 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to ECD, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB927 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB927 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=316&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB316_.HTM |