HI HB311 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various administrative, technical amendments to the liquor license and liquor tax laws. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB311 HD1)
Title
Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to TIA, CPN. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 99). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-2009. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 947) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-09 10:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Chang, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 96), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Herkes, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Luke. | |
2009-02-02 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Cabanilla, Ito, Karamatsu, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Luke. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC-JUD on Monday, 02-02-09 2:00pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |