HI HB309 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the counties to identify and map important agricultural lands. Appropriations.
Title
Relating To Important Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-17 11:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-17 at 11:30AM. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB309 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=309&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB309_.HTM |