HI HB303 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB303
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Department of the Prosecuting Attorney of the City and County of Honolulu for the career criminal prosecution unit.
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Department Of The Prosecuting Attorney Of The City And County Of Honolulu.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB303 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=303&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB303_.HTM |