HI HB299 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 077, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (H) Act 077, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Shortens the time period for filing an application for writ of certiorari with the supreme court from 90 to 30 days, but permits an extension upon written request of up to 30 additional days. Effective January 1, 2012. (SD1)
Title
Court of Appeals; Time Period for Filing Application for Writ of Certiorari
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (H) Act 077, on 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180). | |
2011-06-06 | (S) Act 077, 6/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 688). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused (3). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Deferred one day 04-27-11. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 687). | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 4-14-11 | |
2011-04-21 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) B. Oshiro, Luke, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: B. Oshiro Chair; Luke, Thielen. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 445) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 23). | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching, Mizuno, Morita, M. Oshiro, Saiki, Takumi, Thielen excused (9). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Takai excused (2). | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 604) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Morita, Souki. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-11-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |