HI HB290 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1371).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes qualifying patients or qualifying out-of-state patients to transport medical cannabis between islands for their personal medical use. (HB290 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1371). |
2019-07-09 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1371). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-06-24 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Har, Hashem, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (12) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 55). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 55) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Aquino, Takayama, Thielen. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 714) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1939) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 362). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 942) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |