HI HB2810 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (H) Re-referred to WLO, HAW/CUA, FIN, referral sheet 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (H) Re-referred to WLO, HAW/CUA, FIN, referral sheet 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the designation of a qualifying valley as a valley of historic and cultural significance. Designates Hanalei valley and Waipio valley as valleys of historic and cultural significance.
Title
Valleys of Historic and Cultural Significance; Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, HAW/CUA, FIN, referral sheet 15 | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Friday, 02-03-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to WLO, CUA, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and passed first reading. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2810 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2810_.HTM |