HI HB278 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Act 257, 07/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Act 257, 07/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the executive office on aging to create and implement an Alzheimer's disease and related dementias public health campaign. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | Senate | Act 257, 07/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360). |
2023-07-07 | House | Act 257, on 07/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1360). |
2023-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Deferred one day 05-04-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 93). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 93) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kila, Chun, Kobayashi, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Kila Co-Chairs; Chun, Kobayashi, Garcia. |
2023-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Moriwaki. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 731) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1736) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Kanuha, Shimabukuro. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1266) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 34). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 900), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 725) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-15 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia. |
2023-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-10-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-23. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB595 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Alzheimer's Disease
Appropriation
Department of Health
Executive Office on Aging
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Public Health Campaign
Related Dementias
Appropriation
Department of Health
Executive Office on Aging
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Public Health Campaign
Related Dementias