HI HB2774 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 4:01PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 4:01PM in Conference Room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies certain benchmark goals and timeline for the Department of Education to provide locally-sourced agricultural and food products. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Local Agricultural Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 4:01PM in Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-24 at 2:32PM in Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 1:34PM in conference room 229. |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2024-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-24 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Kidani, Kanuha Co-Chairs; Rhoads, Richards. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Gates, Kahaloa Co-Chairs; La Chica, M. Mizuno, Garcia. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 666) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3804) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported from AEN/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3151) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Richards, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-18-24 3:00PM; CR 229. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EDU, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 175). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 772-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila. |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 527-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-14-24 9:15AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 01-30-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EDN, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |