HI HB2751 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility and credit amount of the low income-household renters' income tax credit. Appropriates funds for the continued administration of the family assessment center for homeless families and for a housing homeless children rental assistance pilot program. Authorizes adoption of interim rules and procurement of services by federally-certified financial counselors without regard to chapters 91 and 103F, Hawaii Revised Statutes, respectively. (HB2751 HD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HSG/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HHS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2989 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:30PM in conference room 325.
Subjects
Family Assessment Center
Housing Homeless Children Rental Assistance Pilot Program ($)
Low-Income Household Renters Tax Credit
Housing Homeless Children Rental Assistance Pilot Program ($)
Low-Income Household Renters Tax Credit