HI HB275 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the group of persons required to report child abuse and neglect to include family members, unless they are victims of domestic violence.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect; Family Members; Mandated Reporting
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 440), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Brower, Belatti, Bertram, Nishimoto, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Shimabukuro. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 02-09-09 8:15 AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |