HI HB2748 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Act 039, 06/08/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Act 039, 06/08/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation (HHFDC) to study and report on housing for populations with access and functional needs. Extends exemption from general excise tax for development costs of affordable rental housing certified by HHFDC. Increases limits on costs eligible for exemption and clarifies eligibility to qualify for the exemption. Prohibits discrimination against tenants based solely on receipt of Section 8 housing assistance. Appropriates funds to the rental housing revolving fund and the dwelling unit revolving fund in fiscal year 2017-2018. (HB2748 CD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-08 | Senate | Act 039, 06/08/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139). |
2018-06-13 | House | Act 039, on 06/08/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 37-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 37-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Mizuno, Nakamura, Gates, Hashem, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Baker, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 815). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Baker, Espero Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Mizuno, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Gates, Hashem, Todd, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 776) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3691) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Kidani, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 10:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HOU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HOU/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 382). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HHS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 9:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HSG/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund
General Excise Tax Exemption
Rental Housing
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Section 8 Housing Choice Vouchers
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund
General Excise Tax Exemption
Rental Housing
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Section 8 Housing Choice Vouchers