HI HB2740 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to establish food waste and local-sourcing goals as part of the sustainable schools initiative. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 3:15PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 350). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1013-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tarnas, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3). |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-01-31 | House | Re-referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Johanson, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:20PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to LHE, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |