HI HB2740 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of education to establish food waste and local-sourcing goals as part of the sustainable schools initiative. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-20 3:15PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2020-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 350).
2020-03-03HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1013-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tarnas, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).
2020-02-06HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 146-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-01-31HouseRe-referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 11
2020-01-30HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Johanson, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:20PM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LHE, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback