HI HB2740 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - (S) Act 188, 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-29 - (S) Act 188, 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset provision relating to the reduction of the fuel tax on naphtha sold for use in a power-generating facility to December 31, 2015. (HB2740 CD1)
Title
Power Generation; Naphtha Fuel Tax; Sunset; Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-29 | (S) Act 188, 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). | |
2012-06-29 | (H) Act 188, on 6/28/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). | |
2012-05-07 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 57-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 57-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Nakashima, Tokioka, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 3:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-12 10:01AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-12 10:00AM in conference room 225. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 754). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Coffman, Kawakami Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Nakashima, Tokioka, Thielen. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 659) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3266) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2951) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-12 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 293). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 714-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Chang, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-12 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and passed first reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB2987 (Same As) 2012-01-27 - (S) Referred to ENE/EDT/AGL, WAM.
SB2986 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 41
SB2986 (Same As) 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 41