HI HB274 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB274
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes county councils as the nominating authority for members of the HCDA who serve as representatives of the Heeia, Kalaeloa, and Kakaako community development districts. Provides that the president of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives shall each nominate representatives of each of the three community development districts.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community Development Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB274 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB800 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB800 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=274&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB274_.HTM |