HI HB2738 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 4:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 4:00pm in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a three-year pilot program to expand availability of health care services coverage for infants and children living in Hawaii. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Children's Health Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 4:00pm in Conference Room 325. |
2018-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 325. |
2018-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; S. Chang. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 770) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3678) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3054) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-15-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Harimoto. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-18 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 123). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 814-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 565-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-13-18 10:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |