HI HB2721 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a fireshed partnership program within the department of land and natural resources. Makes appropriations. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Wildfire Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 417-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Appropriation
DLNR
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Fireshed Management Special Fund
Fireshed Partnership Program
Wildfire Protection
DLNR
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Fireshed Management Special Fund
Fireshed Partnership Program
Wildfire Protection