HI HB2700 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-12 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund and Corporation to provide compensation for property damage resulting from catastrophic wildfires in the State. Creates a process for electric utilities to develop and submit wildfire protection plans to the Public Utilities Commission for approval and allow the recovery of related costs and expenses through securitization, while avoiding a disproportionate impact on a specific ratepayer or county. Declares that the appropriation exceeds the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Wildfires.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 660) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) McKelvey). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3739) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-28-24 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3349) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-21-24 10:30AM; CR 229. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-20-24 9:35AM; CR 229. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 9:42AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 434). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1023-24) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lamosao; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Lowen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-13 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama. |
2024-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-13-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela, Lowen, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from WAL/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Hussey-Burdick, Gates. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souza. |
2024-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/CPC on Friday, 02-02-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3344 (Same As) 2024-04-25 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 816).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Catastrophic Wildfire
Electric Utilities
Expenditure Ceiling
Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund and Corporation
Mitigation
Protection
PUC
Risk Protection Plans
Securitization
Wildfires
Catastrophic Wildfire
Electric Utilities
Expenditure Ceiling
Hawaii Wildfire Relief Fund and Corporation
Mitigation
Protection
PUC
Risk Protection Plans
Securitization
Wildfires