HI HB2698 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to establish or contract with behavioral health crisis centers in each county to provide care, diagnosis, or treatment for persons experiencing a mental illness or substance use disorder crisis. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-24 11:15 AM, House conference room 329. |
2024-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-02-24 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2698&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2698_.HTM |