HI HB2695 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the authorizer's duty from providing three independent auditors to providing a list of approved independent auditors without regard to the number of independent auditors provided for purposes of completing a charter school's annual audit. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Charter Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-11-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
2020-02-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2020-02-04HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 65-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
2020-01-30HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:20PM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LHE, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB3037 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback