HI HB269 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the registrar of the bureau of conveyances to provide, within 10 days and free of charge, an image and index of all instruments that contain real property transactions each week to the administrator of the real property division of a county, to be agreed upon in a memorandum of understanding among the counties. Effective date 1/1/46. (SD1)
Title
Bureau of Conveyances; Counties; Recorded Instruments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Reported from CPN/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 958) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2009-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ihara, Sakamoto. | |
2009-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-09 1:15pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Referred to CPN/TIA, WAM. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 73). | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2009-03-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-09 11:30AM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 591) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-13 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Luke, Mizuno, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Marumoto; 1 Noes: Thielen; and 5 Excused: Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita, Wakai. | |
2009-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-13-09 2:20PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 11 | |
2009-02-02 | (H) Re-referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Pending introduction. |