HI HB2686 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to WLO, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to WLO, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends all rate increases adopted by the board of land and natural resources on December 11, 2009, until the earlier of approval by a majority vote of both houses of the legislature or January 1, 2013.
Title
Harbors; Mooring Rate Increases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to WLO, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2686&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2686_.HTM |