HI HB2685 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to use zero-based budgeting principles in formulating the budget for the 2011-2012 fiscal year.
Title
University of Hawaii Budget; Zero-based Budgeting
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-02-10 2:00pm in House conference room 309. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2010-01-27 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2685&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB2685_.HTM |