HI HB2665 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes green infrastructure objectives, policies, and priority guidelines for state facility systems, infrastructure, transit projects, and other areas in the Hawaii State Planning Act to improve the quality of life for residents and visitors. Requires report to the Legislature. Establishes positions within the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The State Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 503-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2024-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Appropriation
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Green Infrastructure
Greenhouse Gas Sequestration Task Force
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Positions
Report
State Plan
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Green Infrastructure
Greenhouse Gas Sequestration Task Force
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Positions
Report
State Plan