HI HB2650 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Act 002, 3/10/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Act 002, 3/10/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to provide for the expenses of the Legislature, Auditor, Legislative Reference Bureau, Ombudsman, and Ethics Commission. (HB2650 HD1)
Title
Legislative Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Act 002, 3/10/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2014-03-11 | House | Act 002, on 3/10/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1102). |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-03-04 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 385). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2546) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 22). |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 89-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 01-30-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |