HI HB2647 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot project to identify vacant Department of Transportation parcels within the State and to propose uses for those parcels to deter crime and benefit the community. Requires a report to the Legislature. (HB2647 HD1)
Title
Relating To Vacant Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 118-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-02-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |