HI HB2641 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to WTL/ETT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to WTL/ETT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a ten-year redevelopment district pilot project within the Kanoelehua Industrial Area and Banyan Drive region until 6/30/2028. Modifies public land lease restrictions. Appropriates funds. (HB2641 HD2)
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 366). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1128-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 640-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-14-18 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 264-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-02-18 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3058 (Same As) 2018-07-10 - Act 149, on 07/06/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
Subjects
Appropriation
Kanoelehua Industrial Area Pilot Program ($)
Lease Restrictions
Public Lands
Redevelopment
Kanoelehua Industrial Area Pilot Program ($)
Lease Restrictions
Public Lands
Redevelopment