HI HB2610 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to ERB, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Economic Revitalization & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to ERB, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Economic Revitalization & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allow any utility owners whose facility occupies State Highway right-of-way to provide their share of costs up front to the affected state agency for encumbrance of funds in related contracts by way of an agreement to pay.
Title
Highway; Cost Sharing; Utility Owners; Right-of-Way; Relocation
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to ERB, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2872 (Same As) 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 070, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2610 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2610_.htm |