HI HB2608 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "burial site".
Title
Relating To Burial Sites.
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Rose Martinez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2442 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - Referred to WTL/HWN, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2608&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2608_.HTM |