HI HB2606 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires transient accommodations brokers and any other persons or entities to offer, list, advertise, or display a transient accommodations rental rate that includes all resort fees required for the furnishing of transient accommodations. Requires transient accommodations brokers and any other persons or entities to include all applicable taxes and fees imposed by a government on the stay in the total price to be paid before the consumer reserves the furnishing of transient accommodations. Establishes penalties. Effective 1/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-24. |
2024-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Kitagawa excused (2). |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 01-30-24 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to TOU, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Penalties
Rental Rates
Transient Accommodations
Transparency
Unfair Method of Competition
Unfair or Deceptive Acts
Rental Rates
Transient Accommodations
Transparency
Unfair Method of Competition
Unfair or Deceptive Acts
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2606&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2606_.HTM |