HI HB2600 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Cannabis Authority and Cannabis Control Board within the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to regulate all aspects of the cannabis plant. Beginning January 1, 2026, legalizes the personal adult use of cannabis. Establishes taxes for adult-use cannabis sales. Transfers the personnel and assets of the Department of Health and assets Department of Agriculture to the Hawaii Cannabis Authority. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3335 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, M. Mizuno, Sayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos, Chun, Garcia, Garrett, Hashem, Ichiyama, Kila, Kitagawa, Kobayashi, Kong, La Chica, Lamosao, Matayoshi, Matsumoto, Nishimoto, Onishi, Pierick, Souza, Takayama, Takenouchi, Ward, Woodson voting no (23) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3).
Subjects
Adult-Use Cannabis
Appropriation
Cannabis Control Board
DCCA
Department of Agriculture
DOH
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii Cannabis authority
Hemp
Medical Cannabis
Appropriation
Cannabis Control Board
DCCA
Department of Agriculture
DOH
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Hawaii Cannabis authority
Hemp
Medical Cannabis
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2600&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2600_.HTM |