HI HB2588 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to assume control of and remove a vessel grounded on a coral reef or in imminent danger of breaking up if the vessel cannot be removed by the owner within 24 hours of the grounding. Allows the vessel's owner to remain in control of removing a vessel if the owner provides proof of a marine insurance policy listing the State as an additional insured and produces evidence showing that salvage efforts are already underway and that the vessel can be saved within a reasonable amount of time. (HB2588 HD1)
Title
Grounded Vessels
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 366-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. | |
2012-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-03-12 10:10AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-12. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 01-30-12 9:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2850 (Same As) 2012-04-24 - (S) Act 057, 4/23/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).